Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2718 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Turner of Tarrant (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2718
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2718 By:  Powell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing an increase in the student union fee at The
 University of Texas at Arlington.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.529(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The board of regents of The University of Texas System
 may levy a student union fee not to exceed $150 [$39] per student
 for each regular semester and not to exceed $75 [$19.50] per student
 for each term of the summer session, for the sole purpose of
 financing, constructing, operating, maintaining, and improving the
 Student Union Building for The University of Texas at Arlington.
 The [; provided, however, that the] fee may not be increased above
 an amount previously levied [$15 per student for each regular
 semester and $7.50 per student for each term of the summer session]
 unless the increase is approved by a majority vote of those students
 participating in a general election held at the university for that
 purpose.  The ballot proposition for such an election must clearly
 state the amount of the proposed fee increase and describe the
 reason for the proposed fee increase.  The fees herein authorized to
 be levied are in addition to any use or service fee now or hereafter
 authorized to be levied.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.529(a), Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with fees imposed for the 2019 fall
 semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *