Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2757 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Leach (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2757
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2757 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rule of decision in a court of this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 5.001.  RULE OF DECISION. (a) The rule of decision in
 this state consists of those portions of the common law of England
 that are not inconsistent with the constitution or the laws of this
 state, the constitution of this state, and the laws of this state.
 (b)  In any action governed by the laws of this state
 concerning rights and obligations under the law, the American Law
 Institute's Restatements of the Law are not controlling.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *