By: Oliverson, et al. H.B. No. 277 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) (In the Senate - Received from the House March 21, 2019; March 27, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a requirement that online admission application forms for public institutions of higher education include a link to certain comparative gainful employment data. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 51.762, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: (b-1) An electronic common admission application form adopted under this section must include a prominent link to comparative gainful employment data regarding institutions of higher education, including information described by Section 7.040, on a website maintained by the board using data compiled by the board in coordination with the Texas Workforce Commission. SECTION 2. Section 51.763(b), Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The form must: (1) [shall] allow each applicant to: (A) [(1)] apply electronically to one or more of the general academic teaching institutions within the university system; and (B) [(2)] indicate preferences for admission between those institutions; and (2) include a prominent link to comparative gainful employment data regarding institutions of higher education, including information described by Section 7.040, on a website maintained by the board using data compiled by the board in coordination with the Texas Workforce Commission. SECTION 3. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board and the governing board of a university system shall comply with Section 51.762(b-1) or 51.763(b)(2), Education Code, as added by this Act, as applicable, as soon as practicable following the effective date of this Act but not later than January 1, 2020. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *