Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2775 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Krause (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2775
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2775 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the movement of pedestrians in front of, under,
 between, or through rail cars at a railroad grade crossing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 552, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Section 552.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.011.  TRAIN OCCUPYING CROSSING. A pedestrian may
 not move in front of, under, between, or through the cars of a
 moving or stationary train occupying any part of a railroad grade
 crossing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *