Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2793 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Goldman, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2793
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain presumptions relating to the sale of alcoholic
 beverages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 101.10, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *