Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2810 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Kacal, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2810
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exempting certain trailers from being equipped with
 emergency brakes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 547.405(d), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  A trailer, semitrailer, or pole trailer that is equipped
 with air or vacuum brakes or that has a gross weight heavier than
 4,500 [3,000] pounds shall be equipped with brakes that:
 (1)  operate on all wheels required to have brakes
 under Section 547.402; and
 (2)  are promptly applied automatically and remain
 applied for at least 15 minutes in case of a breakaway from the
 towing vehicle.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *