Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2812 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Morrison (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2812
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use by certain municipalities of a perpetual trust
 fund for a cemetery.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 713.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 713.008.  TERMINATION OF MUNICIPAL TRUST BY CERTAIN
 MUNICIPALITIES.  (a)  This section applies to the [The] governing
 body of a municipality in a county with a population of:
 (1)  at least 128,000 but not more than 300,000; or
 (2)  at least 20,000 but not more than 21,000.
 (b)  The governing body of a municipality to which this
 section applies may abolish the municipality's perpetual trust fund
 for a cemetery and use the fund, including both principal and
 interest, for permanent improvements to the cemetery.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *