Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2858 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2019

                    H.B. No. 2858


 AN ACT
 relating to adoption of a uniform swimming pool and spa code for use
 in municipalities in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter C, Chapter 214, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. SWIMMING POOLS AND SPAS [POOL ENCLOSURES]
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 214, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 214.103 to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.103.  INTERNATIONAL SWIMMING POOL AND SPA CODE.
 (a) In this section, "International Swimming Pool and Spa Code"
 means the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code promulgated by
 the International Code Council.
 (b)  To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the
 International Swimming Pool and Spa Code, as it existed on May 1,
 2019, is adopted as the municipal swimming pool and spa code in this
 state.
 (c)  The International Swimming Pool and Spa Code applies to
 all construction, alteration, remodeling, enlargement, and repair
 of swimming pools and spas in a municipality that elects to regulate
 pools or spas, including under Section 214.101.
 (d)  A municipality may establish procedures for:
 (1)  the adoption of local amendments to the
 International Swimming Pool and Spa Code; and
 (2)  the administration and enforcement of the
 International Swimming Pool and Spa Code.
 (e)  A municipality may review and adopt amendments made by
 the International Code Council to the International Swimming Pool
 and Spa Code after May 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2020.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2858 was passed by the House on May 9,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 131, Nays 5, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2858 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2858 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 136,
 Nays 6, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2858 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2858 on May 25, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor