Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2919 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/01/2019

                    86R7614 KKR-D
 By: Shine H.B. No. 2919


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a demonstration program at the State Office of Risk
 Management for real-time processing of workers' compensation
 authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 412, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 412.0129 to read as follows:
 Sec. 412.0129.  AUTHORIZATION OF PAYMENT FOR MEDICAL
 SERVICES AND MEDICAL BILLS REAL-TIME PROCESSING DEMONSTRATION
 PROGRAM. (a)  The office may develop and implement a demonstration
 program for processing workers' compensation authorizations of
 payment for medical services and medical bills in real time if the
 office determines that the program would be cost-effective.
 (b)  The demonstration program described by Subsection (a)
 must include:
 (1)  a secure single platform, Internet-based portal
 for use by the office, state agencies, injured employees, and
 health care providers;
 (2)  the ability to collect, input, and transmit
 administrative and clinical data, including:
 (A)  patient information;
 (B)  provider contracts;
 (C)  treatment guidelines; and
 (D)  other information the office considers
 necessary for processing authorizations and medical bills;
 (3)  an automated process to streamline requests for
 authorizations of payment for medical services and peer reviews at
 the point of care; and
 (4)  return-to-work best practices for workers'
 compensation claims, including complex case management.
 (c)  The workers' compensation research and evaluation group
 shall assist the office in identifying and adopting measures for
 evaluating the demonstration program.
 (d)  The evaluation period for the demonstration program
 shall end on June 30, 2022.
 (e)  If the office implements a demonstration program under
 this section, not later than December 31, 2022, the office shall
 provide to the board a report that:
 (1)  evaluates the program, including any effects of
 the program on administrative cost savings; and
 (2)  recommends whether to use the process implemented
 under the program on a permanent basis.
 (f)  If the report of the demonstration program under
 Subsection (e) indicates that administrative cost savings are
 achieved by the process implemented under the program, the board
 may adopt and use the process on a permanent basis.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the State Office
 of Risk Management shall make a determination as to whether the
 demonstration program described by Section 412.0129, Labor Code, as
 added by this Act, would be cost-effective. If the office
 determines the program would be cost-effective and decides to
 implement the program, the office shall fully implement the program
 not later than January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.