Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB294 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: King of Hemphill (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 294
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays
 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 294 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a petition filed for a place on the ballot for the board
 of directors of the Muleshoe Area Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1068.053, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1068.053.  BALLOT APPLICATION [PETITION].  A person who
 wants to have the person's name printed on the ballot as a candidate
 for director must file with the board secretary an application for a
 place on the ballot [a petition requesting that action].  The
 application [petition] must:
 (1)  [be signed by at least 25 registered voters of the
 district as determined by the most recent official list of
 registered voters;
 [(2)]  be filed not later than the 31st day before the
 date of the election; and
 (2) [(3)]  specify the place for which the person is to
 be a candidate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *