Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2950 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2950
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to perpetual care trust funds and a master trust account.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 712.021(g), Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by Chapters 71 (S.B. 1402) and 1051 (H.B. 1948), Acts of the
 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, is reenacted to read as
 follows:
 (g)  In this subsection, "master trust account" means an
 account containing the perpetual care trust funds of two or more
 certificate holders for the purpose of collective investment and
 administration. The trustors of two or more perpetual care trust
 funds may establish a master trust account in which deposits
 required by this chapter are made, provided that separate records
 of principal and income are maintained for each perpetual care
 cemetery for the benefit of which the master trust account is
 established, and further provided that the income attributable to
 each perpetual care cemetery is used only for the perpetual care of
 that cemetery.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *