Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2984 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Allison, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2984
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2984 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the technology
 applications curriculum.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-3) to read as follows:
 (c-3)  In adopting the essential knowledge and skills for the
 technology applications curriculum for kindergarten through grade
 eight, the State Board of Education shall adopt essential knowledge
 and skills that include coding, computer programming,
 computational thinking, and cybersecurity.  The State Board of
 Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
 knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum
 every five years to ensure the curriculum:
 (1)  is relevant to student education; and
 (2)  aligns with current or emerging professions.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 31, 2020, the State Board
 of Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
 knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum as
 required by Section 28.002(c-3), Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  The State Board of Education is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the board may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *