Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB303 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2019

                    By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 303
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019;
 April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 6, 2019, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas
 11, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 303 By:  Miles


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to entities eligible to authorize the creation of
 spaceport development corporations and to the powers of those
 corporations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 507.003, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 507.003.  AUTHORITY TO CREATE CORPORATION BY ELIGIBLE
 ENTITIES. The following entities are eligible to authorize the
 creation under this subtitle of a spaceport development
 corporation:
 (1)  a county; [or]
 (2)  a municipality with a population of two million or
 more; or
 (3)  a combination of one or more municipalities and
 one or more counties.
 SECTION 2.  Section 507.051, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  If a single county authorizes the creation of a
 spaceport development corporation, the commissioners court of the
 county shall appoint the directors of the corporation. If a single
 municipality authorizes the creation of a spaceport development
 corporation under Section 507.003(2), the governing body of the
 municipality shall appoint the directors of the corporation.
 (b-1)  If more than one political subdivision authorizes the
 creation of a spaceport development corporation, the governing
 bodies of the political subdivisions shall appoint the directors
 through written agreement between the governing bodies.
 SECTION 3.  Section 507.103, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  This section does not apply to a spaceport development
 corporation whose authorizing entity is a single municipality with
 a population of two million or more.
 (a-1)  A spaceport development corporation may exercise the
 power of eminent domain to acquire property for a spaceport,
 including the power to:
 (1)  acquire fee title in land condemned;
 (2)  relocate or modify a railroad, utility line,
 pipeline, or other facility that may interfere with a spaceport; or
 (3)  impose a reasonable restriction on using the
 surface of the property for mineral development if the corporation
 does not own the mineral rights.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *