Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3068 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Flores) H.B. No. 3068
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain license plates on classic motor
 vehicles and travel trailers, custom vehicles, street rods, and
 certain exhibition vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.202, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  A person entitled to license plates under this section
 may instead use, for a vehicle that meets the requirements of
 Section 504.501 or 504.502, disabled veteran license plates issued
 by this state that are:
 (1)  embossed with an alphanumeric pattern;
 (2)  of a plate design that was issued in the same year
 as the model year of the vehicle; and
 (3)  approved for use by the department.
 SECTION 2.  Section 504.501, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  A person eligible for the license plates may instead use
 license plates that are:
 (1)  embossed with an alphanumeric pattern;
 (2)  of a plate design that was [were] issued by this
 state in the same year as the model year of the vehicle; and
 (3)  [are] approved for use by the department.
 (b-1)  The department may require the attachment of a
 registration insignia to a [the] license plate described by
 Subsection (b) in a manner that does not affect the display of
 information originally on the license plate.
 SECTION 3.  Section 504.502, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  A person eligible for the license plates may instead use
 license plates that are:
 (1)  embossed with an alphanumeric pattern;
 (2)  of a plate design that was issued by this state in
 the same year as the model year of the vehicle [and approved by the
 department], provided that a passenger car must bear passenger car
 or truck license plates and a truck must bear passenger car or truck
 license plates; and
 (3)  approved for use by the department.
 (c-1)  The department may require attachment of a
 registration insignia to a [the] license plate described by
 Subsection (c) in a manner that does not affect the display of
 information originally on the license plate.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *