Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB310 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Flynn (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 310
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road
 1570 and Spur 1570 in Hunt County as the John L. Horn Memorial
 Parkway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  JOHN L. HORN MEMORIAL PARKWAY. (a) The
 following highways in Hunt County are designated as the John L. Horn
 Memorial Parkway:
 (1)  the portion of Farm-to-Market Road 1570 between
 its intersection with State Highway 34 and State Highway 66; and
 (2)  Spur 1570 between its intersection with State
 Highway 66 and U.S. Highway 380.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the John L. Horn Memorial Parkway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the parkway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the parkway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *