Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3106 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Goldman, et al. H.B. No. 3106
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman, Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 10, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3106 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that law enforcement agencies enter into
 a certain database information related to investigations of sexual
 assault or other sex offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as Molly Jane's Law.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 420, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 420.035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 420.035.  DUTY TO ENTER CERTAIN INFORMATION INTO
 VIOLENT CRIMINAL APPREHENSION PROGRAM DATABASE. (a)  In this
 section, "database" means the national database of the Violent
 Criminal Apprehension Program established and maintained by the
 Federal Bureau of Investigation, or a successor database.
 (b)  Each law enforcement agency in this state shall request
 access from the Federal Bureau of Investigation to enter
 information into the database.
 (c)  A law enforcement agency that investigates a sexual
 assault or other sex offense shall enter into the database the
 following information regarding the investigation of the sexual
 assault or other sex offense, as available:
 (1)  the suspect's name and date of birth;
 (2)  the specific offense being investigated;
 (3)  a description of the manner in which the offense
 was committed, including any pattern of conduct occurring during
 the course of multiple offenses suspected to have been committed by
 the suspect; and
 (4)  any other information required by the Federal
 Bureau of Investigation for inclusion in the database.
 (d)  Information entered into the database under this
 section is excepted from required disclosure under Chapter 552 in
 the manner provided by Section 552.108.
 SECTION 3.  Section 420.035, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a pending investigation of a sexual
 assault or other sex offense, regardless of whether the
 investigation was commenced before, on, or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *