By: White (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3116 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on best practice standards for the detention of persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "task force" means the task force on best practice standards for the detention of persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities established under this section. (b) The task force is established to conduct a comprehensive study on best practice standards for the detention of a person with an intellectual or developmental disability. The study must identify and make recommendations regarding the following with respect to the detention of persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities: (1) current policies and procedures; (2) barriers to accommodations and justice; (3) best practices used in other states; (4) policies that would improve jail standards; and (5) any other issue the task force considers appropriate. (c) The Commission on Jail Standards shall appoint the members of the task force. The task force must include at least: (1) one representative of the Commission on Jail Standards; (2) one representative of a statewide organization that advocates for individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities; (3) one representative of a city or county governmental agency that supports persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities; (4) one representative of a city or county governmental agency that provides mental health services; (5) one representative of a statewide organization that represents municipalities; (6) one representative of a statewide organization that represents corrections professionals; (7) one representative of a law enforcement entity; and (8) one representative of a county jail. (d) The member appointed under Subsection (c)(1) of this section serves as the presiding officer of the task force. (e) The task force shall prepare a written report that includes: (1) a description of the activities of the task force; (2) the findings and recommendations of the task force; (3) a plan for how the best practice standards identified by the task force can be implemented statewide; (4) any proposals for legislation; and (5) any other matter the task force considers appropriate. (f) Not later than December 1, 2020, the task force shall submit the report prepared under this section to: (1) the governor; (2) the lieutenant governor; (3) the speaker of the house of representatives; and (4) the presiding officers of the standing committees of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over issues relating to criminal justice. (g) The Commission on Jail Standards shall make the report available to the public on the commission's Internet website. (h) The task force is abolished and this Act expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *