Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3143 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2019

                    By: Murphy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3143
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 16, 2019, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3143 By:  Powell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 312.002, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (c-1) and (c-2) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Before the governing body of a taxing unit may adopt,
 amend, repeal, or reauthorize guidelines and criteria, the body
 must hold a public hearing regarding the proposed adoption,
 amendment, repeal, or reauthorization at which members of the
 public are given the opportunity to be heard.
 (c-2)  A taxing unit that maintains an Internet website shall
 post the current version of the guidelines and criteria governing
 tax abatement agreements adopted under this section on the website.
 SECTION 2.  Section 312.005, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  For each of the first three tax years following the
 expiration of a tax abatement agreement executed under this
 chapter, the chief appraiser shall deliver to the comptroller a
 report containing the appraised value of the property that was the
 subject of the agreement.
 SECTION 3.  Section 312.006, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 312.006.  EXPIRATION DATE. If not continued in effect,
 this chapter expires September 1, 2029 [2019].
 SECTION 4.  Section 312.207, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  In addition to any other requirement of law, the public
 notice of a meeting at which the governing body of a municipality or
 other taxing unit will consider the approval of a tax abatement
 agreement with a property owner must contain:
 (1)  the name of the property owner;
 (2)  the name and location of the reinvestment zone in
 which the property subject to the agreement is located;
 (3)  a general description of the nature of the
 improvements or repairs included in the agreement; and
 (4)  the estimated cost of the improvements or repairs.
 (d)  The notice of a meeting required by this section must be
 given in the manner required by Chapter 551, Government Code,
 except that the notice must be provided at least 30 days before the
 scheduled time of the meeting.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter C, Chapter 312, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 312.404 to read as follows:
 Sec. 312.404.  APPROVAL BY GOVERNING BODY. To be effective,
 an agreement made under this subchapter must be approved by the
 governing body of the county or other taxing unit in the manner that
 the governing body of a municipality authorizes an agreement under
 Section 312.207.
 SECTION 6.  Section 312.002(c-1), Tax Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to the adoption, amendment, repeal, or
 reauthorization of guidelines and criteria under Section 312.002,
 Tax Code, on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 7.  Section 312.005(a-1), Tax Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a tax abatement agreement entered into under
 Chapter 312 of that code that expires on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 8.  Sections 312.207(c) and (d) and 312.404, Tax
 Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a tax abatement agreement
 entered into on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *