Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3165 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Oliverson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 3165
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an occupational and life skills associate degree
 program offered by the Lone Star College System District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0106 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0106.  OCCUPATIONAL AND LIFE SKILLS ASSOCIATE
 DEGREE PROGRAM. (a)  The governing board of the Lone Star College
 System District may establish an occupational and life skills
 associate degree program at each junior college in the district.
 (b)  An occupational and life skills associate degree
 program established at a junior college under this section must
 require a student to successfully complete:
 (1)  an appropriate curriculum of required courses for
 the degree program adopted by the governing board of the junior
 college district; and
 (2)  additional courses selected by the student in the
 student's degree plan.
 (c)  Section 61.05151(a) does not apply to an associate
 degree program established under this section.
 (d)  The coordinating board shall adopt rules as necessary
 for the administration of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *