Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3193 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2019

                    H.B. No. 3193


 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing of a home and community support services
 agency; increasing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 142.006(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A license issued under this chapter expires three [two]
 years after the date of issuance. The executive commissioner by
 rule may adopt a system under which licenses expire on various dates
 during the three-year [two-year] period. For the year in which a
 license expiration date is changed, the commission [department]
 shall prorate the license fee on a monthly basis. Each license
 holder shall pay only that portion of the license fee allocable to
 the number of months for which the license is valid. A license
 holder shall pay the total license renewal fee at the time of
 renewal. The commission [department] may issue an initial license
 for a shorter term to conform expiration dates for a locality or an
 applicant. The commission [department] may issue a temporary
 license to an applicant for an initial license.
 SECTION 2.  Section 142.010(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The executive commissioner by rule shall set license
 fees for home and community support services agencies in amounts
 that are reasonable to meet the costs of administering this
 chapter, except that the fees may not be less than $600 or more than
 $2,625 [$2,000] for a license to provide home health, hospice,
 habilitation, or personal assistance services.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement the
 changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3193 was passed by the House on May
 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 137, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3193 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3193 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3193 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3193 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor