Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3222 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: King of Hemphill (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3222
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019;
 May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3222 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a nonresident brewer's or nonresident
 manufacturer's agent's permit; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 3, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 57 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 57. NONRESIDENT BREWER'S OR NONRESIDENT MANUFACTURER'S
 AGENT'S PERMIT
 Sec. 57.001.  AUTHORIZED ACTIVITIES. The holder of a
 nonresident brewer's or nonresident manufacturer's agent's permit
 may:
 (1)  represent one or more:
 (A)  nonresident brewers; and
 (B)  nonresident manufacturers; and
 (2)  on behalf of a nonresident brewer or nonresident
 manufacturer whom the permit holder represents:
 (A)  perform any activity the nonresident brewer
 or nonresident manufacturer whom the permit holder represents could
 perform in this state; and
 (B)  apply for a permit, license, or other
 authorization required by the commission.
 Sec. 57.002.  FEE. The annual state fee for a nonresident
 brewer's or nonresident manufacturer's agent's permit is $2,500.
 Sec. 57.003.  ELIGIBILITY. A nonresident brewer's or
 nonresident manufacturer's agent's permit may be issued only to a
 person who holds a nonresident seller's permit under Chapter 37.
 Sec. 57.004.  RESTRICTION AS TO REPRESENTATION. (a) A
 holder of a nonresident brewer's or nonresident manufacturer's
 agent's permit may not represent a nonresident brewer or a
 nonresident manufacturer unless the permit holder is the primary
 American source of supply for a product produced by the nonresident
 brewer or nonresident manufacturer.
 (b)  In this section, "primary American source of supply"
 means the nonresident brewer or nonresident manufacturer or the
 exclusive agent of the nonresident brewer or nonresident
 manufacturer. To be the "primary American source of supply" the
 nonresident brewer's or nonresident manufacturer's agent must be
 the first source, that is, the brewer or manufacturer or the source
 closest to the brewer or manufacturer, in the channel of commerce
 from whom the product can be secured by Texas wholesalers and
 distributors.
 Sec. 57.005.  AUTHORIZATION BY NONRESIDENT BREWER OR
 NONRESIDENT MANUFACTURER REQUIRED. A nonresident brewer's or
 nonresident manufacturer's agent's permit may not be issued to a
 person unless the person shows to the satisfaction of the
 commission that the person has been authorized to act as the agent
 of a nonresident brewer or nonresident manufacturer the person
 proposes to represent.
 Sec. 57.006.  TERRITORIAL AGREEMENT NOT AFFECTED. Nothing
 in this chapter affects a territorial agreement entered into under
 Subchapter C, Chapter 102.
 Sec. 57.007.  RESPONSIBILITY FOR AGENT'S ACTIONS. A
 nonresident brewer or nonresident manufacturer is responsible for
 any action taken by a nonresident brewer's or nonresident
 manufacturer's agent in the course of the agent's representation of
 the nonresident brewer or nonresident manufacturer under this
 chapter to the same extent and in the same manner as if the action
 had been taken by the nonresident brewer or nonresident
 manufacturer.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *