Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3224 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3224
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3224 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the creation of a defense under the Solid
 Waste Disposal Act for persons engaged in certain recycling
 transactions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (2)  "Recyclable material" has the meaning assigned by
 42 U.S.C. Section 9627(b).
 (b)  The commission, in consultation with industry
 stakeholders, shall:
 (1)  conduct a study on the potential impacts of
 creating a defense to liability under Section 361.271(a)(3) or (4),
 Health and Safety Code, for persons who arrange for recycling of
 recyclable material who would not be liable for the recyclable
 material under 42 U.S.C. Section 9607(a)(3) or (4) based on the
 person meeting the applicable criteria established under 42 U.S.C.
 Section 9627; and
 (2)  propose legislative recommendations based on the
 study.
 (c)  The commission shall establish a workgroup that
 includes industry stakeholders for the purpose of assisting the
 commission in proposing legislative recommendations under
 Subsection (b)(2) of this section.
 (d)  Not later than January 15, 2021, the commission shall
 submit to the legislature a report on the findings of the study and
 legislative recommendations based on the study.
 (e)  This Act expires August 31, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *