Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3252 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Allen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3252
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the posting of certain notices in a primary election.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 172.1111(a) and (c), Election Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Before the opening of the polls during the early voting
 period and on election day, the presiding judge shall post at each
 outside door through which a voter may enter the building in which
 the polling place is located a written notice in bold print of the
 date, hour, and place for each precinct, county, senatorial, or
 state convention that a voter in the precinct may be eligible to
 attend during the election year.
 (c)  The notice must remain posted continuously through the
 early voting period and on election day.
 SECTION 2.  Section 172.1112(a), Election Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The county clerk shall post a notice of the election and
 a notice of consolidated precincts, if applicable, in the manner
 prescribed by Section 4.003(b) for general and special elections.
 The notice of the election shall be posted on the county clerk's
 [party's] Internet website, if the county clerk [party] maintains a
 website.  If the county clerk [party] does not maintain a website,
 the notice shall be posted on the bulletin board used for posting
 notice of meetings of the commissioners court.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *