Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB326 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/13/2018

                    86R788 ATP-D
 By: Ortega H.B. No. 326


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a strategic plan by the secretary of state to increase
 voter turnout.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 31, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.014.  VOTER TURNOUT STRATEGIC PLAN. (a) The
 secretary of state shall prepare and implement a strategic plan
 aimed at increasing voter turnout.
 (b)  In developing the plan, the secretary of state shall use
 evidence-based methods of increasing voter turnout and shall
 collaborate with institutions of higher education to determine the
 most appropriate measures of success and develop performance
 benchmarks for the increase in voter turnout.
 (c)  Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the secretary of state shall report on the progress of the strategic
 plan under this section in increasing voter turnout using the most
 recently updated data to the standing committee of each house of the
 legislature with primary jurisdiction over election matters.
 (d)  This section expires January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  The secretary of state shall adopt the strategic
 plan under Section 31.014, Election Code, as added by this Act, not
 later than January 1, 2020, to be fully implemented not later than
 December 31, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.