Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB330 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: VanDeaver, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 330
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 21, 2019;
 March 27, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to excluding certain students from the computation of
 dropout and completion rates for purposes of public school
 accountability.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.053(g-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (g-1)  In computing dropout and completion rates such as high
 school graduation rates under Subsection (c)(1)(B)(ix), the
 commissioner shall exclude:
 (1)  students who are ordered by a court to attend a
 high school equivalency certificate program but who have not yet
 earned a high school equivalency certificate;
 (2)  students who were previously reported to the state
 as dropouts, including a student who is reported as a dropout,
 reenrolls, and drops out again, regardless of the number of times of
 reenrollment and dropping out;
 (3)  students in attendance who are not in membership
 for purposes of average daily attendance;
 (4)  students whose initial enrollment in a school in
 the United States in grades 7 through 12 was as an unschooled asylee
 or refugee as defined by Section 39.027(a-1);
 (5)  students who are detained at a county
 pre-adjudication or post-adjudication juvenile detention facility
 and:
 (A)  in the district exclusively as a function of
 having been detained at the facility but are otherwise not students
 of the district in which the facility is located; or
 (B)  provided services by an open-enrollment
 charter school exclusively as the result of having been detained at
 the facility; [and]
 (6)  students who are incarcerated in state jails and
 federal penitentiaries as adults and as persons certified to stand
 trial as adults; and
 (7)  students who have suffered a condition, injury, or
 illness that requires substantial medical care and leaves the
 student:
 (A)  unable to attend school; and
 (B)  assigned to a medical or residential
 treatment facility.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *