By: Raymond, Price (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 3304 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019; May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3304 By: Buckingham A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the sunset review of the Texas Health Services Authority and the repeal of certain provisions affecting the electronic exchange of health information. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 182, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 182.004 to read as follows: Sec. 182.004. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas Health Services Authority is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the corporation is abolished and this section, Section 182.001, and Subchapters B and C expire September 1, 2027. SECTION 2. The following provisions of the Health and Safety Code are repealed: (1) Section 182.003; (2) Section 182.052; (3) Section 182.101(b); (4) Section 182.102(c); (5) Section 182.103(d); (6) Section 182.104(b); (7) Section 182.105(b); (8) Section 182.106(b); (9) Section 182.107(d); and (10) Section 182.108(f). SECTION 3. Section 15(b), Chapter 12 (S.B. 203), Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Sections 182.108(g), (h), (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), and (n), Health and Safety Code, effective September 1, 2021, is repealed. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *