Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3343 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Wilson, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 3343
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to honor
 certain Purple Heart recipients; imposing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.5115 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.5115.  CERTAIN PURPLE HEART RECIPIENTS. (a) The
 department shall issue specialty license plates for recipients of a
 Purple Heart awarded by the Department of Public Safety or another
 law enforcement agency in this state.
 (b)  The fee for issuance of one set of the license plates is
 $3.
 (c)  A person issued specialty license plates under this
 section shall be issued one set of the license plates without
 payment of the registration fee required under Chapter 502.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *