Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3361 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3361
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to court reporter service fees in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.601(a-1), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the clerk of each
 court that has an official court reporter and that serves a county
 with a population of 750,000 or more and located on the Texas-Mexico
 border [that contains a municipality with a population of 500,000
 or more] shall collect a court reporter service fee of $30 as a
 court cost in each civil case filed with the clerk to maintain a
 court reporter who is available for assignment in the court.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a case filed with the clerk of a court that has an official court
 reporter on or after the effective date of this Act. A case filed
 with the clerk of the court before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *