Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3405 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/17/2019

                    86R13699 EAS-D
 By: Johnson of Harris, Collier, Reynolds, H.B. No. 3405
 Sherman, Sr., Dominguez, et al.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a sickle cell task force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 50 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 50.  SICKLE CELL TASK FORCE
 Sec. 50.001.  ESTABLISHMENT OF TASK FORCE.  The executive
 commissioner, in collaboration with the members appointed to the
 Newborn Screening Advisory Committee to represent the sickle cell
 community, shall establish and maintain a task force to raise
 awareness of sickle cell disease and sickle cell trait.
 Sec. 50.002.  DUTIES. (a)  The task force shall study and
 advise the department on implementing the recommendations made in
 the 2018 Sickle Cell Advisory Committee Report published by the
 Sickle Cell Advisory Committee or any other report the executive
 commissioner determines is appropriate.
 (b)  The executive commissioner may assign tasks to the task
 force to accomplish the purposes of this chapter.
 Sec. 50.003.  COMPOSITION OF TASK FORCE. The task force is
 composed of the following members appointed by the executive
 commissioner:
 (1)  two members from community-based organizations
 with experience addressing the needs of individuals with sickle
 cell disease;
 (2)  two physicians specializing in hematology;
 (3)  two members of the public, each of whom either has
 sickle cell disease or is a parent of a person with sickle cell
 disease or trait; and
 (4)  one representative of a health-related
 institution.
 Sec. 50.004.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The executive
 commissioner shall provide administrative support services at the
 request of the task force.
 Sec. 50.005.  PRESIDING OFFICER; MEETINGS. (a)  The task
 force shall elect a presiding officer from among its membership.
 (b)  The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (c)  The task force shall hold its first meeting not later
 than December 1, 2019.  This subsection expires September 1, 2021.
 Sec. 50.006.  COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT; GIFTS, GRANTS,
 AND DONATIONS.  A task force member is not entitled to compensation
 for service on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement for
 actual and necessary expenses incurred in performing task force
 duties. The task force may accept gifts, grants, and donations to
 pay for those expenses.
 Sec. 50.007.  ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than December 1 of
 each year, the task force shall prepare and submit to the governor
 and the legislature an annual written report that summarizes the
 task force's work and includes any recommended actions or policy
 changes endorsed by the task force.
 SECTION 2.  The sickle cell task force is not required to
 comply with the reporting requirements under Section 50.007, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, until December 1, 2020.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.