By: Johnson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 3405 (Senate Sponsor - Miles) (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of a sickle cell task force. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Chapter 50 to read as follows: CHAPTER 50. SICKLE CELL TASK FORCE Sec. 50.001. ESTABLISHMENT OF TASK FORCE. The executive commissioner, in collaboration with the members appointed to the Newborn Screening Advisory Committee to represent the sickle cell community, shall establish and maintain a task force to raise awareness of sickle cell disease and sickle cell trait. Sec. 50.002. DUTIES. (a) The task force shall study and advise the department on implementing the recommendations made in the 2018 Sickle Cell Advisory Committee Report published by the Sickle Cell Advisory Committee or any other report the executive commissioner determines is appropriate. (b) The executive commissioner may assign tasks to the task force to accomplish the purposes of this chapter. Sec. 50.003. COMPOSITION OF TASK FORCE. The task force is composed of the following members appointed by the executive commissioner: (1) two members from community-based organizations with experience addressing the needs of individuals with sickle cell disease; (2) two physicians specializing in hematology; (3) two members of the public, each of whom either has sickle cell disease or is a parent of a person with sickle cell disease or trait; and (4) one representative of a health-related institution. Sec. 50.004. ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The executive commissioner shall provide administrative support services at the request of the task force. Sec. 50.005. PRESIDING OFFICER; MEETINGS. (a) The task force shall elect a presiding officer from among its membership. (b) The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding officer. (c) The task force shall hold its first meeting not later than December 1, 2019. This subsection expires September 1, 2021. Sec. 50.006. COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT; GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. A task force member is not entitled to compensation for service on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses incurred in performing task force duties. The task force may accept gifts, grants, and donations to pay for those expenses. Sec. 50.007. ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than December 1 of each year, the task force shall prepare and submit to the governor and the legislature an annual written report that summarizes the task force's work and includes any recommended actions or policy changes endorsed by the task force. SECTION 2. The sickle cell task force is not required to comply with the reporting requirements under Section 50.007, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, until December 1, 2020. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *