Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3440 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Capriglione, Israel, White H.B. No. 3440
 (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the electronic submission of forms, data, and documents
 to the Commission on Jail Standards; imposing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 511, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 511.0104 to read as follows:
 Sec. 511.0104.  ELECTRONIC SUBMISSION OF FORMS, DATA, AND
 DOCUMENTS. (a) The commission shall establish a system for the
 electronic submission of forms, data, and documents required to be
 submitted to the commission under this chapter or a rule adopted
 under this chapter.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a person shall
 submit all forms, data, or documents described by Subsection (a) to
 the commission through the system established under that subsection
 and in a standardized electronic format prescribed by the
 commission.
 (c)  The commission may allow a person to submit the forms,
 data, or documents described by Subsection (a) in a nonelectronic
 format.  The commission shall set and collect a reasonable fee to
 cover the cost of processing the forms, data, or documents.
 (d)  The commission may adopt rules as necessary to implement
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *