Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB345 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Holland, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 345
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the automatic issuance of a personal identification
 certificate to a person 60 years of age or older whose driver's
 license has been surrendered or revoked.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.101, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (m)  The department shall adopt procedures for the automatic
 issuance of a personal identification certificate to a person who
 is 60 years of age or older at the time the person's driver's license
 is surrendered or revoked. The procedures:
 (1)  must be in compliance with federal guidelines
 governing the issuance of identity documents; and
 (2)  may require the person issued a personal
 identification certificate to update information previously
 provided to the department under Section 521.142.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *