Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3463 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3463
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authority of the Lubbock County Hospital District of
 Lubbock County, Texas, to employ physicians.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 1053, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 1053.0601 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1053.0601.  EMPLOYMENT OF PHYSICIANS TO PROVIDE CERTAIN
 HOSPITAL-BASED SERVICES. (a) For purposes of this section,
 "hospital-based services" means the following services when
 provided at a hospital:
 (1)  emergency medicine;
 (2)  general medicine practiced by a hospitalist; and
 (3)  radiology services.
 (b)  The board may employ physicians as the board considers
 necessary to provide hospital-based services at a hospital owned or
 operated by the district as provided by this section.  The board may
 retain all or part of the professional income generated by a
 physician employed by the district for those hospital-based
 services if the board satisfies the requirements of this section.
 (c)  The term of an employment contract entered into under
 this section may not exceed five years.
 (d)  This section may not be construed as authorizing the
 board to:
 (1)  supervise or control the practice of medicine, as
 prohibited by Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code; or
 (2)  employ physicians for any purpose other than the
 provision of hospital-based services at a hospital owned or
 operated by the district.
 (e)  The authority granted to the board under Subsection (b)
 to employ physicians shall apply as necessary for the district to
 fulfill the district's statutory mandate to provide medical and
 hospital care to the district's residents, including the district's
 needy and indigent residents, as provided by Sections 1053.101 and
 1053.104.
 (f)  The medical executive committee of the district shall
 adopt, maintain, and enforce policies to ensure that a physician
 employed by the district exercises the physician's independent
 medical judgment in providing care to patients.
 (g)  The policies adopted by the medical executive committee
 under this section must include:
 (1)  policies relating to:
 (A)  governance of the medical executive
 committee;
 (B)  credentialing;
 (C)  quality assurance;
 (D)  utilization review;
 (E)  peer review;
 (F)  medical decision-making; and
 (G)  due process; and
 (2)  rules requiring the disclosure of financial
 conflicts of interest by a member of the medical executive
 committee.
 (h)  The medical executive committee and the board shall
 jointly develop and implement a conflict management process to
 resolve any conflict between a policy adopted by the medical
 executive committee under this section and a policy of the
 district.
 (i)  A member of the medical executive committee who is a
 physician shall provide biennially to the chair of the medical
 executive committee a signed, verified statement indicating that
 the committee member:
 (1)  is licensed by the Texas Medical Board;
 (2)  will exercise independent medical judgment in all
 medical executive committee matters, including matters relating
 to:
 (A)  credentialing;
 (B)  quality assurance;
 (C)  utilization review;
 (D)  peer review;
 (E)  medical decision-making; and
 (F)  due process;
 (3)  will exercise the committee member's best efforts
 to ensure compliance with the policies that are adopted or
 established by the medical executive committee; and
 (4)  will report immediately to the Texas Medical Board
 any action or event that the committee member reasonably and in good
 faith believes constitutes a compromise of the independent medical
 judgment of a physician in caring for a patient.
 (j)  For all matters relating to the practice of medicine,
 each physician employed by the district shall ultimately report to
 the chair of the medical executive committee for the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *