Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3538 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/06/2019

                    86R9135 JSC-F
 By: Rose H.B. No. 3538


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Opioid and Substance Abuse
 Advisory Council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle E, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 112 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 112. OPIOID AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE ADVISORY COUNCIL
 Sec. 112.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Advisory council" means the Opioid and Substance
 Abuse Advisory Council established under this chapter.
 (2)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 Sec. 112.002.  ESTABLISHMENT; PURPOSE. The commission shall
 establish the Opioid and Substance Abuse Advisory Council to study
 and make recommendations to address opioid and substance abuse in
 this state.
 Sec. 112.003.  MEMBERS. (a) The advisory council is
 composed of members appointed by the governor with the advice and
 consent of the senate.
 (b)  The advisory council must include:
 (1)  a medical examiner;
 (2)  a pharmacist licensed in this state;
 (3)  a social worker who focuses on the issue of
 substance abuse;
 (4)  a member of a publicly funded addiction treatment
 program;
 (5)  a member of a privately funded addiction treatment
 program;
 (6)  a physician specializing in addiction treatment;
 (7)  an emergency room physician;
 (8)  a psychologist specializing in addiction
 treatment;
 (9)  a licensed counselor specializing in alcohol and
 drug abuse cases;
 (10)  a forensic pathologist;
 (11)  two chief executive officers from two different
 health care systems;
 (12)  a representative of a private health insurance
 company;
 (13)  a representative from the Medicaid managed care
 program;
 (14)  a member of an advocacy group focusing on
 substance abuse prevention, treatment, and recovery;
 (15)  a first responder who is emergency medical
 services personnel;
 (16)  a juvenile court judge;
 (17)  a district court judge;
 (18)  an employee of the Department of Public Safety
 with duties related to criminal investigations involving
 controlled substances or other drugs;
 (19)  an employee of the Texas Board of Pharmacy with
 duties related to the prescription monitoring program;
 (20)  a member of the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department;
 (21)  a member of the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice;
 (22)  a member from the Texas A&M University Health
 Science Center Opioid Task Force;
 (23)  a member of the Texas Medical Association who
 serves on the American Medical Association Opioid Task Force; and
 (24)  a law enforcement official from an area
 designated as a High Intensity Drug Trafficking Area by the United
 States Drug Enforcement Administration.
 Sec. 112.004.  TERMS; VACANCY. (a)  Advisory council members
 serve staggered four-year terms with half the members' terms
 expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 (b)  A member may serve more than one term.
 (c)  If a vacancy occurs on the advisory council, a person
 shall be appointed to fill the vacancy for the unexpired term.
 Sec. 112.005.  OFFICERS; SUBCOMMITTEES. (a)  Advisory
 council members shall:
 (1)  elect a chair and a vice chair; and
 (2)  establish the duties of the chair and the vice
 chair.
 (b)  The chair may appoint subcommittees.
 Sec. 112.006.  MEETINGS. The advisory council shall meet at
 least four times each year.
 Sec. 112.007.  COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT. A member of
 the advisory council may not receive compensation for service on
 the advisory council but is entitled to reimbursement of the travel
 expenses incurred by the member while conducting the business of
 the advisory council, as provided by the General Appropriations
 Act.
 Sec. 112.008.  DUTIES. The advisory council shall:
 (1)  serve as a central location for opioid and
 substance abuse information;
 (2)  maintain and provide the latest statistics and
 information concerning research on opioid and substance abuse;
 (3)  develop or recommend best practices for opioid and
 substance abuse prevention and treatment, relevant training, and
 psychological and substance abuse treatments; and
 (4)  make policy recommendations related to opioid and
 substance abuse prevention and treatment.
 Sec. 112.009.  REPORT. (a)  Not later than January 1 of each
 odd-numbered year, the advisory council shall provide a report to
 the governor, the lieutenant governor, the legislature, and the
 commission.
 (b)  The report must include any findings and
 recommendations made by the advisory council regarding:
 (1)  the advisory council's functions;
 (2)  strategic planning initiatives; and
 (3)  recommendations for proposed legislation.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2019, the
 governor shall appoint the Opioid and Substance Abuse Advisory
 Council members as required by Chapter 112, Health and Safety Code,
 as added by this Act.
 (b)  In making the initial appointments, the governor shall
 designate half the members to a term expiring February 1, 2021, and
 half the members to a term expiring February 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.