Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3540 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Burns, Raymond, Collier H.B. No. 3540
 (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a peace officer to release in lieu of
 arrest certain persons with an intellectual or developmental
 disability.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 14, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 14.035 to read as follows:
 Art. 14.035.  AUTHORITY TO RELEASE IN LIEU OF ARREST CERTAIN
 PERSONS WITH INTELLECTUAL OR DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY.  (a)  This
 article applies only to a person with an intellectual or
 developmental disability who resides at one of the following types
 of facilities operated under the home and community-based services
 waiver program in accordance with Section 1915(c) of the Social
 Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1396n):
 (1)  a group home; or
 (2)  an intermediate care facility for persons with an
 intellectual or developmental disability (ICF/IID) as defined by 40
 T.A.C. Section 9.153.
 (b)  In lieu of arresting a person described by Subsection
 (a), a peace officer may release the person at the person's
 residence if the officer:
 (1)  believes confinement of the person in a
 correctional facility as defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, is
 unnecessary to protect the person and the other persons who reside
 at the residence; and
 (2)  made reasonable efforts to consult with the staff
 at the person's residence and with the person regarding that
 decision.
 (c)  A peace officer and the agency or political subdivision
 that employs the peace officer may not be held liable for damage to
 persons or property that results from the actions of a person
 released under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *