Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB356 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Lang (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 356
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of a statute allowing the county attorney or
 commissioners court of Brown County to accept gifts or grants to
 finance or assist the operation of the office of county attorney.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 45.125, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *