Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3609 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Martinez Fischer (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3609
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019;
 May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the filing of an assumed name certificate by certain
 business entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 71.103(a), Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A [The] corporation, limited partnership, limited
 liability partnership, limited liability company, or foreign
 filing entity required to file a certificate under Section 71.101
 shall file the certificate in the office of the secretary of state
 [and in the office or offices of each county clerk as specified by
 Subsection (b) or (c)].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 71.103(b) and (c) and 71.104(b),
 Business & Commerce Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The repeal by this Act of Sections 71.103(b) and
 (c) and 71.104(b), Business & Commerce Code, and the changes in law
 made by this Act to Section 71.103(a), Business & Commerce Code,
 apply only to an offense under Section 71.202, Business & Commerce
 Code, committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this
 section, an offense was committed before the effective date of this
 Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *