Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3635 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Turner of Dallas, et al. H.B. No. 3635
 (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to financial assistance paid to the survivors of certain
 law enforcement officers, firefighters, and other public employees
 killed in the line of duty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 615.022, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 615.022.  PAYMENT TO SURVIVORS. (a)  If there is an
 eligible surviving spouse, the state shall pay the benefits
 described by Subsection (d) [$500,000] to the eligible surviving
 spouse.
 (b)  If there is no eligible surviving spouse, the state
 shall pay the benefits described by Subsection (d) [$500,000] in
 equal shares to surviving children.
 (c)  If there is no eligible surviving spouse or child, the
 state shall pay the benefits described by Subsection (d) [$500,000]
 in equal shares to surviving parents.
 (d)  An eligible survivor, or eligible survivors in equal
 shares, are entitled to receive a lump sum payment in the amount
 provided by this subsection.  The lump sum payment amount payable to
 an eligible survivor during the 12 months beginning September 1,
 2019, is $500,000.  Effective September 1 of each following year,
 the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas by
 rule shall adjust the amount of the lump sum payment required under
 this subsection by an amount equal to the percentage change in the
 Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers, published by the
 Bureau of Labor Statistics of the United States Department of Labor
 for the preceding year.  The amount paid to an eligible survivor or
 survivors as adjusted under this subsection is calculated based on
 the date of the decedent's death and not on the date the eligible
 survivor or survivors file a claim under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 payment of assistance to survivors of certain public employees on
 or after the effective date of this Act regardless of the date the
 public employee died.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *