Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3652 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Turner of Tarrant, et al. H.B. No. 3652
 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton, West)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a state repository for open educational
 resources by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0670 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0670.  STATE REPOSITORY OF OPEN EDUCATIONAL
 RESOURCES. (a)  In this section, "open educational resource" has
 the meaning assigned by Section 51.451.
 (b)  The board shall contract with a high-quality open
 educational resource repository to develop and maintain a web
 portal customized to meet the needs of individual institutions of
 higher education, students, and others who may benefit from access
 to open educational resources.
 (c)  Open educational resources available through the portal
 must be searchable by course or learning outcome, program or field
 of study, marketable skills, college readiness, and other topics as
 determined by the board.
 (d)  The portal must provide access to repositories
 maintaining a wide range of open educational resources, including
 textbooks, full courses, course materials, modules, images,
 videos, assessment software, and any other tools, materials, or
 techniques used to support learning.
 (e)  Resources developed with state funds shall be made
 available under a Creative Commons license and submitted for use as
 an open educational resource through a repository available through
 the portal. A publisher may submit instructional materials for
 inclusion in a repository available through the portal.
 (f)  The board may request the assistance of the Learning
 Technology Advisory Committee to establish, maintain, and market
 the web portal required under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board shall develop the web portal
 required under Section 61.0670, Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *