Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3688 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: White (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3688
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the apprehension of a child after escape from a secure
 juvenile facility or violation of conditions of release under
 supervision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 243.051(a), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  If a child who has been committed to the department and
 placed by the department in any institution or facility has escaped
 or has been released under supervision and broken the conditions of
 release:
 (1)  a sheriff, deputy sheriff, constable, special
 investigator, or peace [police] officer may, without a warrant,
 arrest the child; or
 (2)  a department employee designated by the executive
 director may, without a warrant or other order, take the child into
 the custody of the department.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *