Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3704 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3704
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 13, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3704 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain public health data maintained by the Department
 of State Health Services and shared with certain local health
 entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.089 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.089.  PUBLIC HEALTH DATA.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Essential public health services" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 121.002.
 (2)  "Local public health entity" means a local health
 unit, local health department, or public health district.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Sections 81.103, 82.009, 88.002(b),
 92.006, and 192.002(b), the department may enter into an agreement
 with a local public health entity that provides essential public
 health services to provide the entity access to:
 (1)  identified public health data relating to the
 entity's jurisdiction and any public health data relating to a
 jurisdiction contiguous to the entity; and
 (2)  deidentified public health data maintained by the
 department relating to the jurisdiction of any other local public
 health entity.
 (c)  The public health data obtained through the agreement
 may be used only in the provision of essential public health
 services.
 (d)  Access to public health data includes necessary
 identified public health data required for an infectious disease
 investigation conducted under Chapter 81.
 (e)  For any public health data request that is not subject
 to Subsection (b), (c), or (d) and except as provided by Subsection
 (f), the department shall establish a review process for the
 consideration of public health data requests relating to essential
 public health services or public health research. The process must
 evaluate:
 (1)  the public health benefit and purpose of the
 request;
 (2)  the privacy of the individuals whose data is
 requested;
 (3)  the management of the data by the requestor,
 including management of public health data released to the
 requestor in previous requests; and
 (4)  other relevant law.
 (f)  A local public health entity seeking public health data
 for human subject research purposes must submit a request to the
 department's institutional review board for review and
 consideration.
 (g)  A local public health entity receiving public health
 data from the department under this section shall:
 (1)  maintain the integrity and security of the data;
 and
 (2)  comply with state and federal privacy laws.
 SECTION 2.  The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement Section
 1001.089(e), Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *