Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3867 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2019

                    H.B. No. 3867


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Public Utility Commission of Texas
 to retain assistance for regional proceedings affecting certain
 electric utilities and consumers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.004.  HIRING ASSISTANCE FOR REGIONAL PROCEEDINGS.
 (a) The commission may retain any consultant, accountant, auditor,
 engineer, or attorney the commission considers necessary to
 represent the commission in a proceeding before a regional
 transmission organization, or before a court reviewing proceedings
 of a regional transmission organization, related to:
 (1)  the relationship of an electric utility to a power
 region, regional transmission organization, or independent system
 operator;
 (2)  the approval of an agreement among an electric
 utility and the electric utility's affiliates concerning the
 coordination of the operations of the electric utility and the
 electric utility's affiliates; or
 (3)  other matters related to an electric utility that
 may affect the ultimate rates paid by retail customers in this
 state.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Sections 39.402(a), 39.452(d), and
 39.502(b), this section applies to an electric utility to which
 Subchapter I, J, or K applies.
 (c)  Assistance for which a consultant, accountant, auditor,
 engineer, or attorney may be retained under Subsection (a) may
 include:
 (1)  conducting a study;
 (2)  conducting an investigation;
 (3)  presenting evidence;
 (4)  advising the commission; or
 (5)  representing the commission.
 (d)  The electric utility that is the subject of the
 proceeding shall pay timely the reasonable costs of the services of
 a person retained under Subsection (a), as determined by the
 commission. The total costs an electric utility is required to pay
 under this subsection may not exceed $1.5 million in a 12-month
 period.
 (e)  The commission shall allow an electric utility to
 recover both the total costs the electric utility paid under
 Subsection (d) and the carrying charges for those costs through a
 rider established annually to recover the costs paid and carrying
 charges incurred during the preceding calendar year. The rider may
 not be implemented before the rider is reviewed and approved by the
 commission.
 (f)  The commission shall consult the attorney general
 before the commission retains a consultant, accountant, auditor, or
 engineer under Subsection (a). The retention of an attorney under
 Subsection (a) is subject to the approval of the attorney general
 under Section 402.0212, Government Code.
 (g)  The commission shall be precluded from engaging any
 individual who is required to register under Section 305.003,
 Government Code.
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3867 was passed by the House on May 3,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3867 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 0,
 3 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3867 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor