86R12480 LED-F By: Capriglione H.B. No. 3887 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to enrollment of certain retirees in and cost-sharing for the Texas Public School Employees Group Insurance Program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1575.161, Insurance Code, is amended by adding Subsections (b) and (c) to read as follows: (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the trustee by rule shall provide one opportunity to reenroll in a health benefit plan offered under the group program for an otherwise eligible retiree: (1) who is eligible to enroll in Medicare; (2) whose initial enrollment was voluntarily terminated on or after January 1, 2017, and on or before December 31, 2018; and (3) who opts to reenroll on or before December 31, 2023. (c) Subsection (b) and this subsection expire September 1, 2024. SECTION 2. Section 1575.202(a), Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) Each state fiscal year, the state shall contribute to the fund an amount equal to a percentage [1.25 percent] of the salary of each active employee as follows: (1) for the 2020 and 2021 fiscal years, 2.25 percent; (2) for the 2022 fiscal year, 2.5 percent; (3) for the 2023 fiscal year, 2.75 percent; (4) for the 2024 fiscal year, three percent; (5) for the 2025 fiscal year, 3.25 percent; (6) for the 2026 fiscal year, 3.5 percent; (7) for the 2027 fiscal year, 3.75 percent; (8) for the 2028 fiscal year, four percent; and (9) for the 2029 fiscal year, and each subsequent fiscal year, 4.25 percent. SECTION 3. Section 1575.212, Insurance Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: (c) The trustee may not increase the payments under Subsection (a-1) for a biennium in which the legislature does not increase annuities under Chapter 824, Government Code. SECTION 4. (a) Not later than November 1, 2019, the Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section 1575.161(b), Insurance Code, as added by this Act. (b) Rules adopted by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas under Section 1575.161(b), Insurance Code, as added by this Act, must apply to a retiree described by that subsection, regardless of whether the termination of the retiree's initial enrollment occurred before, on, or after the effective date of the rules or this Act. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.