Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB39 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Zerwas, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 39
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of certain time limitations on the award of
 grants by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas
 Oversight Committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 102.254, Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *