By: Frank, Minjarez, Klick H.B. No. 3950 (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019; May 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3950 By: Campbell A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of the Joint Committee on Child Welfare. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) In this section: (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services Commission. (2) "Committee" means the Joint Committee on Child Welfare. (3) "Community-based care" has the meaning assigned by Section 264.152, Family Code. (4) "Department" means the Department of Family and Protective Services. (b) The Joint Committee on Child Welfare is composed of nine voting members as follows: (1) three members appointed by the governor; (2) three members of the senate, appointed by the lieutenant governor; and (3) three members of the house of representatives, appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives. (c) The lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of representatives shall each appoint a member described by Subsection (b)(2) or (3) of this section, respectively, to serve as joint chairs of the committee. (d) The committee shall meet at least quarterly at the call of the joint chairs and may consider public testimony. (e) The committee may employ persons necessary to carry out this section through funds made available by the legislature. (f) The committee shall monitor and report to the legislature on the following related to the implementation of community-based care and the federal Family First Prevention Services Act (Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123): (1) all sources of funding for the continued implementation of community-based care and family preservation and other related prevention services; (2) a timeline for the complete implementation of community-based care and additional resources the department will require to meet that timeline, including enhanced training related to procurement, contract monitoring and enforcement services, information technology services, and financial and legal services; (3) barriers to using federal and state money and necessary purchased services to achieve greater numbers of children and youth who remain safely with their families by reviewing and effectively maximizing: (A) the prevention and early intervention services currently available in this state; and (B) any services relating to families entering the child protective services system; (4) the placement of children in settings eligible for federal financial participation under the requirements of the federal Family First Prevention Services Act; (5) any other beneficial programs or services available under the federal Family First Prevention Services Act; and (6) legislative or regulatory barriers to full implementation of community-based care. (g) The committee may request relevant information from the commission, the department, or other relevant state agencies, and the commission, the department, or other agencies shall comply with the request, unless the provision of the information is prohibited by state or federal law. (h) The committee shall submit a written report described by Subsection (f) of this section to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each member of the standing committees of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over child welfare issues not later than September 1, 2020. (i) The committee shall monitor the continued implementation of community-based care and family preservation and other related prevention services, and the implementation plan developed by the department under Section 264.153, Family Code. (j) The committee shall submit a final evaluation of the implementation of community-based care to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each member of the standing committees of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over child welfare issues not later than December 30, 2024. (k) The committee is abolished and this Act expires December 31, 2024. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *