Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB410 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: White, Bailes H.B. No. 410
 (Senate Sponsor - Johnson, Flores, Perry)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 410 By:  Johnson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of meat and other food products.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 433.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivisions (1-a), (2-a), (10-a), (11-a),
 (19-a), (23-a), and (26) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Beef" means any edible portion of a formerly
 live and whole cattle carcass, not derived by synthetic or
 artificial means.
 (2-a)  "Chicken" means any edible portion of a formerly
 live and whole chicken carcass, not derived by synthetic or
 artificial means.
 (10-a)  "Lamb" means any edible portion of a formerly
 live and whole lamb carcass, not derived by synthetic or artificial
 means.
 (11-a)  "Meat" means any edible portion of a livestock
 carcass that does not contain lab-grown, cell cultured, insect, or
 plant-based products.
 (19-a)  "Pork" means any edible portion of a formerly
 live and whole swine carcass, not derived by synthetic or
 artificial means.
 (23-a)  "Rabbit" means any edible portion of a formerly
 live and whole rabbit, not derived by synthetic or artificial
 means.
 (26)  "Turkey" means any edible portion of a formerly
 live and whole turkey carcass, not derived by synthetic or
 artificial means.
 SECTION 2.  Section 433.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A food product is misbranded if:
 (1)  the food product is misrepresented as harvested
 meat through the use of false or misleading advertising or
 labeling; or
 (2)  any part of the food product's labeling includes
 the terms "meat," "beef," "chicken," "pork," "turkey," "lamb,"
 "rabbit," or any common variation of those terms and the product
 does not contain the product described by the term listed on the
 label.
 SECTION 3.  Section 433.0245, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-1), (e), and (f) and amending
 Subsections (b), (c), and (d) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  For purposes of this section, a low-volume livestock
 processing establishment:
 (1)  includes an establishment that processes fewer
 than 10,000 domestic rabbits or more than 1,000 but fewer than
 10,000 poultry in a calendar year; and
 (2)  does not include an establishment that processes
 1,000 or fewer poultry raised by the operator of the establishment
 in a calendar year.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), a [A]
 low-volume livestock processing establishment that is exempt from
 federal inspection shall register with the department in accordance
 with rules adopted by the executive commissioner for registration.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), a [A]
 low-volume livestock processing establishment that is exempt from
 federal inspection shall develop a sanitary operation procedures
 plan.
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), if [If]
 contaminated livestock can be reasonably traced to a low-volume
 livestock processing establishment that is exempt from federal
 inspection, the department may request the attorney general or the
 district or county attorney in the jurisdiction where the facility
 is located to institute a civil suit to enjoin the operation of the
 establishment until the department determines that the
 establishment has been sanitized and is operating safely.
 (e)  A low-volume livestock processing establishment that is
 exempt from federal inspection and processes fewer than 500
 domestic rabbits in a calendar year is not required to comply with
 Subsection (b) or (c).
 (f)  An establishment described by Subsection (a-1)(2):
 (1)  is not subject to additional state regulation; and
 (2)  may sell poultry products directly to:
 (A)  consumers; and
 (B)  restaurants that provide food for immediate
 human consumption.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *