Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB410 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2019

                    H.B. No. 410


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of certain low-volume and other
 livestock processing establishments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 433.0245, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-1), (e), and (f) and amending
 Subsections (b), (c), and (d) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  For purposes of this section, a low-volume livestock
 processing establishment:
 (1)  includes an establishment that processes fewer
 than 10,000 domestic rabbits or more than 1,000 but fewer than
 10,000 poultry in a calendar year; and
 (2)  does not include an establishment that processes
 1,000 or fewer poultry raised by the operator of the establishment
 in a calendar year.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), a [A]
 low-volume livestock processing establishment that is exempt from
 federal inspection shall register with the department in accordance
 with rules adopted by the executive commissioner for registration.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), a [A]
 low-volume livestock processing establishment that is exempt from
 federal inspection shall develop a sanitary operation procedures
 plan.
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), if [If]
 contaminated livestock can be reasonably traced to a low-volume
 livestock processing establishment that is exempt from federal
 inspection, the department may request the attorney general or the
 district or county attorney in the jurisdiction where the facility
 is located to institute a civil suit to enjoin the operation of the
 establishment until the department determines that the
 establishment has been sanitized and is operating safely.
 (e)  A low-volume livestock processing establishment that is
 exempt from federal inspection and processes fewer than 500
 domestic rabbits in a calendar year is not required to comply with
 Subsection (b) or (c).
 (f)  An establishment described by Subsection (a-1)(2):
 (1)  is not subject to additional state regulation; and
 (2)  may sell poultry products directly to consumers.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 410 was passed by the House on April
 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 410 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 410 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 2, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 410 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 410 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor