Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4153 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/08/2019

                    86R11605 BRG-D
 By: Anchia H.B. No. 4153


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of alternative annuity payments payable to
 surviving spouses and designated beneficiaries of persons
 wrongfully imprisoned.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 103.0535, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection
 (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d)  An election under this section must be made not later
 than the 45th day after the date:
 (1)  on which the claimant files with the comptroller
 the application required by Section 103.051; or
 (2)  on which the claimant experiences one of the
 following life-changing events:
 (A)  a change in the employment status of the
 claimant or a spouse, dependent, or beneficiary of the claimant;
 (B)  marriage or divorce of the claimant;
 (C)  the addition of a dependent of the claimant;
 or
 (D)  the death of a dependent, spouse, or
 beneficiary of the claimant.
 (d-1)  An election under Subsection (d) must be made on a
 form prescribed by the comptroller that:
 (1)  identifies the claimant's spouse or designated
 beneficiary according to Section 103.0536; and
 (2)  specifies the option selected under Subsection
 (c).
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Notwithstanding Section 103.0535(d), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, a person
 entitled to compensation under Section 103.001(a), Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, who started receiving annuity payments before
 the effective date of this Act may elect to receive any remaining
 payments as alternative annuity payments under Section 103.0535,
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, by filing
 the form described by Section 103.0535(d-1), Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, as added by this Act, with the comptroller after
 December 31, 2019, and before March 1, 2020. The value of
 alternative annuity payments elected under this subsection must be
 actuarially equivalent to the remaining value of the annuity
 payments the person would receive absent the election.  This
 subsection does not affect the ability of a person described by this
 subsection to make an election under Section 103.0535(d), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, following a
 life-changing event described by that subsection.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2019, the comptroller shall
 provide notice to all persons entitled to compensation under
 Section 103.001(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, of:
 (1)  the opportunity described by Subsection (a) of
 this section to elect to receive alternative annuity payments under
 Section 103.0535, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by
 this Act; and
 (2)  the opportunity to elect to receive alternative
 annuity payments after a life-changing event under Section
 103.0535(d), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this
 Act.
 (c)  The comptroller shall provide the notice required by
 Subsection (b) of this section by:
 (1)  certified mail to a person's last known address;
 and
 (2)  phone call to the phone number that the
 comptroller has on file for the person.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.