Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4166 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 4166
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of the feasibility of the expansion of
 navigation on the Red River by the Red River Authority of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The Red River Authority of Texas shall study
 the feasibility of increasing navigation on the Red River between
 Texarkana and Denison by completing the navigation system of locks
 and dams or other means.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2021, the Red River Authority
 of Texas shall submit to the standing committees of the legislature
 having jurisdiction over navigation a report on the findings of the
 study.
 (c)  This section expires January 2, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *