Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB449 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Turner of Tarrant, et al. H.B. No. 449
 (Senate Sponsor - Watson, Menéndez, West)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 19, 2019, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a public or private institution of
 higher education include a notation on a student's transcript under
 certain circumstances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9364 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9364.  CERTAIN NOTATIONS REQUIRED ON STUDENT
 TRANSCRIPTS. (a) In this section, "postsecondary educational
 institution" means an institution of higher education or a private
 or independent institution of higher education, as those terms are
 defined by Section 61.003.
 (b)  If a student is ineligible to reenroll in a
 postsecondary educational institution for a reason other than an
 academic or financial reason, the institution shall include on the
 student's transcript a notation stating that the student is
 ineligible to reenroll in the institution for a reason other than an
 academic or financial reason.
 (c)  If a student withdraws from a postsecondary educational
 institution pending disciplinary charges that may result in the
 student becoming ineligible to reenroll in the institution for a
 reason other than an academic or financial reason, the institution
 may not end the disciplinary process until the institution makes a
 final determination of responsibility, including, if applicable, a
 determination of whether the student will be ineligible to reenroll
 in the institution for a reason other than an academic or financial
 reason.  If, as a result of the disciplinary process, the student is
 ineligible to reenroll in the institution for a reason other than an
 academic or financial reason, the institution shall include on the
 student's transcript the notation required under Subsection (b).
 (d)  On request by the student, a postsecondary educational
 institution may remove from a student's transcript a notation
 required under this section if:
 (1)  the student is eligible to reenroll in the
 institution; or
 (2)  the institution determines that good cause exists
 to remove the notation.
 (e)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 adopt rules as necessary to implement this section.  In adopting
 those rules, the coordinating board shall use the negotiated
 rulemaking procedures under Chapter 2008, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall adopt the rules required by Section 51.9364, Education Code,
 as added by this Act, as soon as practicable after this Act takes
 effect.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies
 beginning with the 2019 fall semester.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *